NY A07409 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - print number 7409a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - print number 7409a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the delivery of services that are clinical in nature by persons serving in programs under the jurisdiction of the department of mental hygiene, while under a level of supervision by a licensed professional as determined by the appropriate mental hygiene commissioner.
Title
Relates to the delivery of services that are clinical in nature by persons serving in programs under the jurisdiction of the department of mental hygiene, while under a level of supervision by a licensed professional as determined by the appropriate mental hygiene commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7409a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06378 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6378A