NY A07394 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the livery driver benefit fund.
Title
Relates to the livery driver benefit fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | approval memo.9 |
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.452 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5025 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.667 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.667 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05025 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7394