NY A07372 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - print number 7372a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - print number 7372a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the attorney general to approve certain state land acquisitions made for the purposes of land conservation, and to accept a title policy from a commercial insurer to cover any title defects that would otherwise render the title unmarketable.
Title
Authorizes the attorney general to approve certain state land acquisitions made for the purposes of land conservation, and to accept a title policy from a commercial insurer to cover any title defects that would otherwise render the title unmarketable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Assembly | print number 7372a |
2024-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06606 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING