NY A07332 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning licensure, limits on fees and interest and disclosure practices of businesses engaged in pension loan advancements.
Title
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning licensure, limits on fees and interest and disclosure practices of businesses engaged in pension loan advancements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.142 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | print number 7332a |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2013-05-10 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05716 (Same As) 2014-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5716A