NY A07310 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds certain substances already listed under 21 U.S.C. Section 812 to the schedules of controlled substances.
Title
Adds certain substances already listed under 21 U.S.C. Section 812 to the schedules of controlled substances.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] | Asm. Michael Tannousis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.238 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.470 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7310a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06596 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH