NY A07277 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from December 1, 2018 to December 1, 2021, the expiration of the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional mortgage recording tax.
Title
Extends from December 1, 2018 to December 1, 2021, the expiration of the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional mortgage recording tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6430 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.369 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.369 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06430 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.514