NY A07277 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires informational materials regarding the use of opioid antagonists for first aid or emergency treatment to provide information of the application of good samaritan laws to protect against liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires informational materials regarding the use of opioid antagonists for first aid or emergency treatment to provide information of the application of good samaritan laws to protect against liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1328
2019-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6361
2019-05-22SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
2019-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.362
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-04-18Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04660 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06361 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7277

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback