NY A07259 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - RECOMMITTED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - RECOMMITTED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7259b |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-13 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.566 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | print number 7259a |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00908 (Same As) 2014-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 908C