NY A07255 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of law relating to excess medical malpractice insurance.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of law relating to excess medical malpractice insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.156 |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1190 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7057 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.405 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.405 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07057 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7255