NY A07244 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medical assistance coverage for medically tailored meals and medical nutrition therapy for the purpose of disease management.
Title
Requires medical assistance coverage for medically tailored meals and medical nutrition therapy for the purpose of disease management.
Sponsors
Asm. Tony Simone [D] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Ron Kim [D] |
Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04790 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - referred to ways and means