NY A07232 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the timeliness of disclosure of a breach of the security of a system which contains private information.
Title
Relates to the timeliness of disclosure of a breach of the security of a system which contains private information.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7232a |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01104 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES