NY A07230 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the primary care reform commission to review, examine, and make findings on the level of primary care spending by all payers in the context of all health care spending in the state and publish an annual report on the findings, and also make recommendations to increase and strengthen spending on primary care in the state and improve primary care infrastructure, taking care to avoid increasing costs to patients or the total cost of health care.
Title
Establishes the primary care reform commission to review, examine, and make findings on the level of primary care spending by all payers in the context of all health care spending in the state and publish an annual report on the findings, and also make recommendations to increase and strengthen spending on primary care in the state and improve primary care infrastructure, taking care to avoid increasing costs to patients or the total cost of health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.55 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.596 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6534C |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.405 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.405 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 7230b |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | print number 7230a |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06534 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7230B