NY A07227 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 7227a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 7227a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Thomas Collins to file a request for change of benefit coverage with the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Title
Authorizes Thomas Collins to file a request for change of benefit coverage with the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 7227a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06223 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental employees