NY A07215 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the Brockport Volunteer Ambulance Corps tax exempt status from the Town of Sweden retroactively.
Title
Grants the Brockport Volunteer Ambulance Corps tax exempt status from the Town of Sweden retroactively.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5531 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.602 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05531 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.251