NY A07215 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming certain actions of the Oneonta fire district.
Title
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming certain actions of the Oneonta fire district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4541 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.554 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.554 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04541 (Same As) 2015-11-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.3