NY A07175 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - advanced to third reading cal.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - advanced to third reading cal.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to arbitration organizations; requires private arbitration organizations involved in fifty or more consumer arbitrations per year to collect, publish at least quarterly, and make available to the public in a computer-searchable database certain information relating to such arbitrations; prohibits financial conflicts of interest.
Title
Relates to arbitration organizations; requires private arbitration organizations involved in fifty or more consumer arbitrations per year to collect, publish at least quarterly, and make available to the public in a computer-searchable database certain information relating to such arbitrations; prohibits financial conflicts of interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.304 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |