NY A07166 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - print number 7166a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - print number 7166a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the venison donation tax credit.
Title
Establishes the venison donation tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | print number 7166a |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04123 (Same As) 2016-03-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE