NY A07164 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4963a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4963a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts by the Pearl River union free school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the state education department.
Title
Validates certain acts by the Pearl River union free school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the state education department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4963a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.800 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7164a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04963 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - VETOED MEMO.44