NY A07155 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - approval memo.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - approval memo.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for crediting of probationary service when a person appointed provisionally in accordance with section sixty-five of the civil service law receives a permanent appointment to the same title.
Title
Provides for crediting of probationary service when a person appointed provisionally in accordance with section sixty-five of the civil service law receives a permanent appointment to the same title.
Sponsors
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | Assembly | approval memo.6 |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | signed chap.356 |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1314 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5494 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.179 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.179 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05494 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7155