NY A07142 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing vehicles containing three or more passengers to utilize the high occupancy lane on the Staten Island Expressway.
Title
Relates to allowing vehicles containing three or more passengers to utilize the high occupancy lane on the Staten Island Expressway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7142a |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04968 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN