NY A07140 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s4888a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s4888a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York city employees' retirement system to consider the application for disability retirement benefits from Peter DiMario.
Title
Authorizes the New York city employees' retirement system to consider the application for disability retirement benefits from Peter DiMario.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4888a |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.542 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | print number 7140a |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04888 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.558