NY A07132 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - substituted by s6777a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - substituted by s6777a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides language translation services to accommodate census self-reporting.
Title
Provides language translation services to accommodate census self-reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assembly | substituted by s6777a |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.473 |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | print number 7132a |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06777 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - VETOED MEMO.98