NY A07132 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - print number 7132c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - print number 7132c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit for farmers who use qualified biodiesel fuel for the sole operation of their farm equipment.
Title
Provides a tax credit for farmers who use qualified biodiesel fuel for the sole operation of their farm equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7132c |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | print number 7132b |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-26 | Assembly | print number 7132a |
2012-01-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02989 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - PRINT NUMBER 2989C