NY A07131 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13Senatesigned chap.280
2019-09-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.955
2019-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5095
2019-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.542
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-04-11Assemblyreference changed to economic development
2019-04-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05095 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7131

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07131&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07131&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07131
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07131&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07131&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07131&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7131#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback