NY A07123 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - signed chap.619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - signed chap.619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions of the health savings account pilot program until December 31, 2024.
Title
Extends the provisions of the health savings account pilot program until December 31, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Assembly | signed chap.619 |
2021-11-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1166 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6485A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.335 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06485 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7123