NY A07114 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Congregation Divrei Chaim of Monsey to file an exemption for real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes Congregation Divrei Chaim of Monsey to file an exemption for real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.189 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1696 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1775A |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.153 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7114a |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01775 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7114A