NY A07102 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to competency exams, service of charges, petitions to modify or vacate orders, profiling requirements and modifying physician and advertising and testimony standards.
Title
Relates to competency exams, service of charges, petitions to modify or vacate orders, profiling requirements and modifying physician and advertising and testimony standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | print number 7102b |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7102a |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04527 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH