NY A07086 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires veteran organizations to provide assistance to veterans which adequately addresses military sexual trauma experienced by veterans due to their military service.
Title
Requires veteran organizations to provide assistance to veterans which adequately addresses military sexual trauma experienced by veterans due to their military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7086a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.338 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.430 |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S06381 (Same As) 2014-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE