NY A07057 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for service of subpoena and delivery of records.
Title
Provides for service of subpoena and delivery of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.269 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.384 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05621 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES