NY A07053 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confinement of companion animals in unattended motor vehicles under conditions that endanger the health or well-being of an animal and what can be done in the event an animal is seen suffering; adds paid or volunteer firefighters and emergency services personnel as persons authorized to remove such companion animals from unattended vehicles because of extreme temperatures; and provides penalties.
Title
Relates to the confinement of companion animals in unattended motor vehicles under conditions that endanger the health or well-being of an animal and what can be done in the event an animal is seen suffering; adds paid or volunteer firefighters and emergency services personnel as persons authorized to remove such companion animals from unattended vehicles because of extreme temperatures; and provides penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.137 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1046 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5054 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.158 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05054 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - signed chap.137