NY A07048 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the requirement that rent arrears be repaid; forgives any outstanding repayment agreements for rent arrears.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes the requirement that rent arrears be repaid; forgives any outstanding repayment agreements for rent arrears.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-05-06Assemblyprint number 7048a
2021-05-06Assemblyamend and recommit to social services
2021-04-21Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S06845 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback