NY A07016 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - amended on third reading 7016a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - amended on third reading 7016a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to available transportation for correction facility visitation; provides for at a minimum, bi-monthly free transportation from the city of New York, Rochester, Syracuse and Albany.
Title
Relates to available transportation for correction facility visitation; provides for at a minimum, bi-monthly free transportation from the city of New York, Rochester, Syracuse and Albany.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7016a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.493 |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.359 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05693 (Same As) 2018-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5693A