NY A07010 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of social services to implement a policy whereby the department shall not make multiple monthly payments for rental housing costs attributable to unrelated public assistance recipients residing at the same residence or address, so as to pay more than twenty percent above the fair market rental value of such single-family housing; provides certain exemptions.
Title
Directs the commissioner of social services to implement a policy whereby the department shall not make multiple monthly payments for rental housing costs attributable to unrelated public assistance recipients residing at the same residence or address, so as to pay more than twenty percent above the fair market rental value of such single-family housing; provides certain exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to social services | |
2009-06-03 | print number 7010a | |
2009-06-03 | amend and recommit to social services | |
2009-03-18 | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S4272-A (Same As) 2010-06-16 - referred to social services