NY A06992 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of veterans' services to provide legal and/or technical support to veterans who want to change such veteran's discharged status to honorable because such person was dishonorably or administratively discharged from the armed services due to sexual orientation.
Title
Requires the department of veterans' services to provide legal and/or technical support to veterans who want to change such veteran's discharged status to honorable because such person was dishonorably or administratively discharged from the armed services due to sexual orientation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | print number 6992a |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07201 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS