NY A06974 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reimbursement criteria for child care absences.
Title
Relates to reimbursement criteria for child care absences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.487 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.228 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05448 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE