NY A06901 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to raising the tax abatement rate and extending certain deadlines for purposes of the green roof tax abatement for certain properties in a city of one million or more persons.
Title
Relates to raising the tax abatement rate and extending certain deadlines for purposes of the green roof tax abatement for certain properties in a city of one million or more persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6901a |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06409 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - referred to real property taxation