NY A06866 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Congregation Talmund Torah D' Chasidei Bobov Monsey to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Congregation Talmund Torah D' Chasidei Bobov Monsey to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Senate | signed chap.287 |
2011-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1472 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5125 |
2011-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.63 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.63 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-04-27 | Assembly | print number 6866a |
2011-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05125 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6866A