NY A06846 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Victims Information Bureau of Suffolk, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2009-2010 and 2010-2011 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes Victims Information Bureau of Suffolk, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2009-2010 and 2010-2011 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.410 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.410 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | print number 6846b |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-01-11 | Assembly | print number 6846a |
2012-01-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04442 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES