NY A06777 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing parents with the right and authority to exempt their children from taking standardized assessments.
Title
Relates to providing parents with the right and authority to exempt their children from taking standardized assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.432 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-02 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05337 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION