NY A06772 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s2991a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s2991a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a process server to obstruct from performing his or her lawful duty, or as retaliation against the process server for performing his or her lawful duty.
Title
Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a process server to obstruct from performing his or her lawful duty, or as retaliation against the process server for performing his or her lawful duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s2991a |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.553 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | print number 6772a |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-04-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02991 (Same As) 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.268