NY A06770 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of health to implement a community food security, empowerment and economic development program (SEED) to help meet the food need of low-income people and promote comprehensive responses to local food, farm and nutrition issues; provides grants for the cost of program projects which will be available to non-profit organizations and local governments, with limited partnership with for-profit enterprises; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes the department of health to implement a community food security, empowerment and economic development program (SEED) to help meet the food need of low-income people and promote comprehensive responses to local food, farm and nutrition issues; provides grants for the cost of program projects which will be available to non-profit organizations and local governments, with limited partnership with for-profit enterprises; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04955 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH