NY A06658 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-21)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to support orders for adult dependent children; provides that parents or kinship caregivers of an adult child under the age of 26 are chargeable with support of such individual provided such individual is diagnosed with a developmental disability as defined in section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to support orders for adult dependent children; provides that parents or kinship caregivers of an adult child under the age of 26 are chargeable with support of such individual provided such individual is diagnosed with a developmental disability as defined in section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.593
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.593
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-15Assemblyprint number 6658c
2019-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 6658b
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-07Assemblyprint number 6658a
2019-05-07Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-03-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S05276 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5276B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06658
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06658A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06658B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06658C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06658&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback