NY A06596 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rate of interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for the purpose of calculating contributions to the New York city employees' retirement system, the New York city teachers' retirement system, the police pension fund, the fire department pension fund and the board of education retirement system of such city by public employers and other obligors required to make employer contributions to such retirement systems, the crediting of special interest and additional interest to members of such retirement systems, and the allowance of supplementary interest on the funds of such retirement systems.
Title
Relates to the rate of interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for the purpose of calculating contributions to the New York city employees' retirement system, the New York city teachers' retirement system, the police pension fund, the fire department pension fund and the board of education retirement system of such city by public employers and other obligors required to make employer contributions to such retirement systems, the crediting of special interest and additional interest to members of such retirement systems, and the allowance of supplementary interest on the funds of such retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.76 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.427 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a6596a |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.750 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4488A |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4488a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.427 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | print number 6596a |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04488 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.76