NY A06592 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Essex to impose an additional three-quarters of one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Essex to impose an additional three-quarters of one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.522 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.522 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04558 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS