NY A06591 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for rifle hunting in Rockland county.
Title
Allows for rifle hunting in Rockland county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | print number 6591a |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |