NY A06590 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.744
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.744
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of economic development, in consultation with the commissioner of health, labor and OCFS to study, develop, and implement a long-term strategy to support the growth of the caregiving industry in New York state.
Title
Directs the commissioner of economic development, in consultation with the commissioner of health, labor and OCFS to study, develop, and implement a long-term strategy to support the growth of the caregiving industry in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.744 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1261 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4652B |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.351 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.351 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 6590b |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6590a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04652 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6590B