NY A06522 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - approval memo.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - approval memo.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of a "disguised gun" to include a weapon or device capable of being concealed on a person from which a shot can be discharged through the energy of an explosive which is designed and intended to appear to be a toy gun.
Title
Amends the definition of a "disguised gun" to include a weapon or device capable of being concealed on a person from which a shot can be discharged through the energy of an explosive which is designed and intended to appear to be a toy gun.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Assembly | approval memo.26 |
2021-10-28 | Assembly | signed chap.518 |
2021-10-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1714 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7152 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07152 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6522