NY A06505 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-21)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s4630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s4630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the collocation of certain facilities; prohibits the Western New York Children's Psychiatric Center from being collocated or merged with any other facility.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the collocation of certain facilities; prohibits the Western New York Children's Psychiatric Center from being collocated or merged with any other facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4630 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.292 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S04630 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.195