NY A06499 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to manufacturers of alcohol and their interest in any premises where alcohol is sold and to retail licenses.
Title
Relates to manufacturers of alcohol and their interest in any premises where alcohol is sold and to retail licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in economic development |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6499a |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04812 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 4812D