NY A06475 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - substituted by s5545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - substituted by s5545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to absentee ballots for school district elections during a declared disaster emergency; a voter can apply for an absentee ballot when they are unable to appear personally at the polling place of the school district in which they are a qualified voter because there is a risk of contracting or spreading a disease that may cause illness to the voter or to other members of the public.
Title
Relates to absentee ballots for school district elections during a declared disaster emergency; a voter can apply for an absentee ballot when they are unable to appear personally at the polling place of the school district in which they are a qualified voter because there is a risk of contracting or spreading a disease that may cause illness to the voter or to other members of the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Assembly | substituted by s5545 |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.211 |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05545 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - SIGNED CHAP.60